Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykola Petro Luchok, O.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Giru Marcelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1974 Born
1994²19.7EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2000²25.7Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jun 200329.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Nov 201945.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács), Ukraine
11 Nov 201945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
10 Dec 201945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mykola Petro Luchok
Bishop Mykola Petro Luchok O.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMukachevo
Ordained PriestMukachevo, Diocese of Mukachevo (Munkács)
Ordained BishopSaint Martin of Tours, Cathedral, Mukachevo, Diocese of Mukachevo (Munkács)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mukachevo (Munkács).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2019
  • c1: CB, 11 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 15 Nov 2019
  • c2: CB, 8 Dec 2019
  • c34: CB, 10 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 12 Dec 2019

Quantcast