Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Majnek, O.F.M.

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1951 BornBudapest
17 Apr 198230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Dec 199544.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zakarpattia, Ukraine
9 Dec 199544.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
6 Jan 199644.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
7 Oct 199745.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zakarpattia, Ukraine
27 Mar 200250.4AppointedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Antal Majnek:
Bishop Antal Majnek O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mukachevo (Munkács).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 486
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013