Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oleksandr Yazlovetskiy

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Tulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1979 Born
18 Feb 200222.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
26 Jun 200425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
18 Sep 201940.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine
18 Sep 201940.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
9 Nov 201940.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana

MicroData Summary for Oleksandr Yazlovetskiy
Bishop Oleksandr Yazlovetskiy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHybalivka, Sharhorod Raion, Vinnytsia Oblas, Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2019
  • c1/opd/bp: CB, 18 Sep 2019
  • ob: CB, 21 Oct 2019
  • c2+: CB, 7 Nov 2019
  • c0: CB, 12 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 15 Nov 2019

Quantcast