Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

Dioecesis Kioviensis-Zytomeriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Petro Herkulan Malchuk, O.F.M., Bishop
  • Jan Purwinski, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 November 1998
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lviv
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ukraine
  • Square Kilometers: 111,600 (43,105 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.rkc.lviv.ua/Cx4.php3?L=e&D=G
  • Mailing Address: vul. Basejna 9, 10014 Zhytomyr, Ukraina; vul. Kostyolna 17, 01001 Kyiv, Ukraina
  • Telephone: (0412)47.49.28; (044)279.73.09
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Zytomir
28 October 1925SplitDiocese of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz Diocese of Lutsk
Diocese of Zytomir
Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr
25 November 1998Name ChangedDiocese of Zytomir Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr
4 May 2002Territory LostDiocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi
Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr
Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr
1999300,00018,295,3001.6%3064943,19189116130ap2000
2000300,00017,407,5001.7%36641003,00090126135ap2001
2001300,00017,407,5001.7%36721082,77797148148ap2002
2002300,00017,407,5001.7%37741112,702101154157ap2003
2003270,0008,688,0003.1%39651042,59686137146ap2004
2004270,0008,688,0003.1%35721072,52393145149ap2005
2009250,0008,164,3543.1%41891301,923199167154ap2010
2013220,0008,181,7782.7%55961511,4561108165161ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015