Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Teofil Skalski

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Zytomir, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1877Born
10 Jun 190023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
1 May 192649.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zytomir, Ukraine
15 Apr 195881.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Zytomir, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Teofil Skalski
Father Teofil Skalski (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Zytomir

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKyryivka
Death PlaceMszana Dolna, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

  • a priest for 57.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 10 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast