Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petro Herkulan Malchuk, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1965BornSloboda Rashkiv, Moldova
7 Jun 199226.9Ordained PriestPriest
199327.4ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Mar 200842.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine
29 Mar 200842.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Media
3 May 200842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Media
15 Jun 201145.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine
27 May 201650.8DiedBishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Petro Herkulan Malchuk
Archbishop Petro Herkulan Malchuk O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,737
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • d: CB, 27 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 May 2016