Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maksymilian Leon Dubrawski, O.F.M.

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1949 Born
31 Aug 198233.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 May 198333.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Aug 198637.1Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Apr 199848.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
7 Apr 199848.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
27 Jun 199848.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
4 May 200252.8AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Maksymilian Leon Dubrawski
Bishop Maksymilian Leon Dubrawski O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubovets
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,347
  • mn/ente/prof: CB, 17 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast