Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Radosław Zmitrowicz, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

Titular Bishop of Gypsaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1962 BornGdańsk, Poland
21 May 198724.7Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 Jun 198926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 Nov 201250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
29 Nov 201250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gypsaria
9 Feb 201350.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gypsaria

MicroData Summary for Radosław Zmitrowicz:
Bishop Radosław Zmitrowicz O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2012
  • ob/c4: CB, 2 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013