Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavlo Honcharuk

Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1978 Born
22 Jun 200224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
6 Jan 202041.9AppointedBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
14 Feb 202042.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Pavlo Honcharuk
Bishop Pavlo Honcharuk (born ) Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKornachivka (Yarmolyntsi), Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kharkiv, Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast