Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Maria Morfino, S.D.B.

Bishop of Alghero-Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1958 BornArborea
12 Sep 197517.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Sep 198325.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jun 198527.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Jul 198628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jan 201152.9AppointedBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
3 Apr 201153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro Maria Morfino:
Bishop Mauro Maria Morfino S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Alghero-Bosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alghero-Bosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,985
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014