Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Przybylski

Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

Titular Bishop of Hortanum (Horta)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1964 Born
28 May 199227.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Częstochowa, Poland
30 May 199328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
20 May 201752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
20 May 201752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hortanum (Horta)
24 Jun 201752.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hortanum (Horta)

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Przybylski (VIAF: 161449279)
Bishop Andrzej Przybylski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁowicz, Diocese of Łowicz
Ordained PriestHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Częstochowa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2017
  • ob/c1: CB, 20 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017