Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Wójcik

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz-Radom

Titular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1914BornByszówka
11 Jun 193924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
26 Oct 196046.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
26 Oct 196046.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
2 Feb 196146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
22 Nov 199076.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Walenty Wójcik:
Bishop Walenty Wójcik (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz-Radom

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013