Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Lityński

Auxiliary Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

Titular Bishop of Cemerinianus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1962 BornKożuchów
5 Jun 198826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gorzów, Poland
28 Apr 201249.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland
28 Apr 201249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
16 Jun 201250.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Lityński:
Bishop Tadeusz Lityński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zielona Góra-Gorzów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2012
  • ob: CB, 2 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 20 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013