Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Jamrozek

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1960 BornRzeszów
13 Jan 198928.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
14 Jun 198929.1Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
20 Apr 201353.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
20 Apr 201353.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chełm
20 May 201353.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chełm

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Jamrozek:
Bishop Stanisław Jamrozek (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 20 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 22 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013