Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Rojek

Bishop of Zamość-Lubaczów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1955 BornRzeszów
7 Jun 198126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Dec 200550.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Dec 200550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
2 Feb 200650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi
30 Jun 201257.2AppointedBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
11 Aug 201257.3InstalledBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Rojek:
Bishop Marian Rojek (born ) Bishop of Zamość-Lubaczów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamość-Lubaczów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,051
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013