Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Styrna

Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1941 Born
27 Jun 196524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
22 Jun 199150.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
22 Jun 199150.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
28 Jul 199150.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
2 Aug 200362.5AppointedBishop of Elbląg, Poland
23 Aug 200362.5InstalledBishop of Elbląg, Poland
10 May 201473.2ResignedBishop of Elbląg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Styrna
Bishop Jan Styrna (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzczepanów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Elbląg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,605
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018