Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Eugeniusz Bialoglowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Rzeszów

Titular Bishop of Pomaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1947 BornRzeplin
17 Jun 197225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Nov 198740.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Nov 198740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
6 Jan 198840.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
25 Mar 199245.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rzeszów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Eugeniusz Bialoglowski
Bishop Edward Eugeniusz Bialoglowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rzeszów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rzeszów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,607

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016