Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Jan Groblicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1908Born
9 Apr 193324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 May 196051.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 May 196051.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
18 Sep 196051.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
1 Feb 199283.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
4 May 199586.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Julian Jan Groblicki (VIAF: 311579829)
Bishop Julian Jan Groblicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBieżanów, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained Priestsw. Stanisława i sw. Wacława, Cathedral, Wawel, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained Bishopsw. Stanisława i sw. Wacława, Cathedral Basilica, Wawel, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Death PlaceZakopane, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Bieżanów, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 93
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995, Page 862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast