Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Pietraszko

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Turrisblanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1911Born
5 Apr 193624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
23 Nov 196251.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
23 Nov 196251.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Turrisblanda
15 Apr 196351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turrisblanda
2 Mar 198876.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Pietraszko
Bishop Jan Pietraszko (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuczkowice

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast