Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Komar

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

Titular Bishop of Alinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1872BornKoprzywnica
9 Aug 189725.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 192149.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
16 Jun 192149.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
11 Sep 192149.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
1936²64.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
29 Sep 194371.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Komar:
Bishop Edward Komar (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013