Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boleslaw Lukasz Taborski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Dices


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1917Born
10 Sep 193921.8Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
31 Oct 196346.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
31 Oct 196346.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dices
2 Feb 196446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dices
27 Feb 199375.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Nov 200487.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Boleslaw Lukasz Taborski
Bishop Boleslaw Lukasz Taborski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaroslaw

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast