Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrea Ripa

Under Secretary of the Congregation for the Clergy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1972 Born
25 Sep 200432.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
12 Sep 201745.6AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Ripa (VIAF: 171241396)
Father Andrea Ripa (born ) Under Secretary of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2019

Quantcast