Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lambiasi

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1947 Born
25 Sep 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
6 Mar 199951.5AppointedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
23 May 199951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
28 Jun 200254.8ResignedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
3 Jul 200759.8AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
15 Sep 200760.0InstalledBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lambiasi
Bishop Francesco Lambiasi (born ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassiano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rimini.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast