Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Petrocchi

Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1948 Born
14 Sep 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
27 Jun 199849.8AppointedBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
20 Sep 199850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
18 Oct 199850.1InstalledBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
8 Jun 201364.8AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
7 Jul 201364.8InstalledArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
28 Jun 201869.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201869.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Petrocchi (VIAF: 89359432)
Giuseppe Cardinal Petrocchi (born ) Archbishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained PriestSan Pietro Martire, Church, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopSan Francesco, Basilica, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of L’Aquila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,430
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2013
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • c1/i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018
  • loc.sp: AM, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast