Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Avelino Bettencourt

Apostolic Nuncio to Armenia

Titular Archbishop of Aemona

Apostolic Nuncio to Georgia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1962 Born
29 Jun 199331.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
26 Feb 201855.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio
26 Feb 201855.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aemona
1 Mar 201855.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Armenia
8 Mar 201855.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Georgia
19 Mar 201855.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aemona

MicroData Summary for José Avelino Bettencourt
Archbishop José Avelino Bettencourt (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelas, Diocese of Angra, Portugal
Ordained BishopSaint Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Armenia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Feb 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2018
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast