Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Javier Herrera Corona

Apostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Vulturaria

Apostolic Nuncio to Gabon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1968 Born
21 Sep 199325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Autlán, Jalisco, México
5 Feb 202253.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
5 Feb 202253.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
5 Feb 202253.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vulturaria
23 Apr 202253.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vulturaria

MicroData Summary for Javier Herrera Corona
(WikiData: Q110820157)
Archbishop Javier Herrera Corona (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Congo, Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutlán de Navarro, Diocese of Autlán, Jalisco, México
Ordained PriestAutlán de Navarro, Diocese of Autlán, Jalisco, México
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Santa Maria de Guadalupe, Seminary, Autlán de Navarro, Diocese of Autlán, Jalisco, México

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Congo, Republic of.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2022
  • c34: CB, 23 Apr 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Number 20,900

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 28 Jan 2024