Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mauricio Rueda Beltz

Under Secretary of the Secretariat of State

Titular See: (Section for Diplomatic Staff)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1970 Born
19 Dec 199626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotį, Colombia
17 Dec 202050.9AppointedUnder Secretary of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Mauricio Rueda Beltz
Father Mauricio Rueda Beltz (born ) Under Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotą, Archdiocese of Bogotį, Colombia

Please contact the Father through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Dec 2020

Quantcast