Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Gobbi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Imola, Italy

Titular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1915Born
10 Jul 193823.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 196752.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Imola, Italy
22 Apr 196752.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
14 May 196752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
29 Nov 197358.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aldo Gobbi
Bishop Aldo Gobbi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBovole

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018