Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Lenny

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Rotdon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1928Born
21 Jun 195324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
3 May 197445.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 May 197445.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
16 Jun 197445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
16 Jul 197849.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Lenny
Bishop Francis Lenny (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCookstown
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast