Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gervas John Mwasikwabhila Nyaisonga

Archbishop of Mbeya, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1966 Born
11 Jul 199629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mbeya, Tanzania
9 Jan 201144.1AppointedBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
19 Mar 201144.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
17 Feb 201447.2AppointedBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania
4 May 201447.5InstalledBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania
21 Dec 201852.1AppointedArchbishop of Mbeya, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Gervas John Mwasikwabhila Nyaisonga
Archbishop Gervas John Mwasikwabhila Nyaisonga (born ) Archbishop of Mbeya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBunda
Ordained BishopSaint Paul of the Cross, Cathedral, Dodoma, Diocese of Dodoma

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mbeya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,967
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 4 May 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 21 Dec 2018

Quantcast