Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evaristo Marc Chengula, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mbeya, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1941Born
15 Oct 197029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
8 Nov 199655.8AppointedBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
2 Feb 199756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
21 Nov 201877.8DiedBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Evaristo Marc Chengula
Bishop Evaristo Marc Chengula I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Mbeya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMdabulo
Ordained BishopOpen Air, stade Sokoine, Mbeya, Archdiocese of Mbeya
Death PlaceDar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,917
  • d: CB, 21 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 21 Dec 2018

Quantcast