Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Castor Paul Msemwa

Deceased

Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1955Born
7 Jun 198732.3Ordained PriestPriest of Njombe, Tanzania
7 Dec 200449.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
30 Jan 200549.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
25 Aug 200550.5SucceededBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
19 Oct 201762.6DiedBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Castor Paul Msemwa
Bishop Castor Paul Msemwa (born , died ) Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKitulira
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tunduru, Diocese of Tunduru-Masasi
Death PlaceMuscat

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,817
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2005
  • d: CB, 19 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018