Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Titus Joseph Mdoe

Bishop of Mtwara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1961 BornLushoto
24 Jun 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tanga, Tanzania
16 Feb 201351.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
16 Feb 201351.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
1 May 201352.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna
15 Oct 201554.5AppointedBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Titus Joseph Mdoe:
Bishop Titus Joseph Mdoe (born ) Bishop of Mtwara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mtwara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,780
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015