Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Brot

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Marciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1892BornMontrouge
3 Jul 191522.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 195259.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
24 Jun 195259.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
11 Oct 195259.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
Dec 1966³74.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
28 Oct 197179.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Brot:
Bishop Pierre Brot (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013