Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Dela Vega Afable

Bishop of Digos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1951 BornDavao
24 Apr 197625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Davao, Philippines
21 Apr 200150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
21 Apr 200150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vadesi
12 Jul 200150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vadesi
24 Apr 200251.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Digos, Philippines
11 Feb 200351.9SucceededBishop of Digos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Dela Vega Afable:
Bishop Guillermo Dela Vega Afable (born ) Bishop of Digos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Digos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013