Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Treveno Cabajar, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Pagadian, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1942 Born
2 Jul 196118.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 196421.7Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Dec 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 May 200461.5AppointedBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
14 Aug 200461.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
2 Sep 200461.9InstalledBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
22 Nov 201876.1RetiredBishop of Pagadian, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Treveno Cabajar
Bishop Emmanuel Treveno Cabajar C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pagadian

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHandayan Getafe
Ordained BishopOur Mother of Perpetual Help, Church, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pagadian.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,670
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Nov 2018

Quantcast