Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Capiral San Diego

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pasig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1935BornObando
21 Dec 196328.1Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
6 Jun 198347.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Palawan, Philippines
6 Jun 198347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zica
10 Aug 198347.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zica
18 Dec 198752.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Palawan, Philippines
12 Jul 199559.7AppointedBishop of San Pablo, Philippines
28 Jun 200367.7AppointedBishop of Pasig, Philippines
21 Aug 200367.8InstalledBishop of Pasig, Philippines
21 Dec 201075.1RetiredBishop of Pasig, Philippines
26 Aug 201579.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pasig, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Capiral San Diego:
Bishop Francisco Capiral San Diego (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pasig

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2010
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015