Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Broderick Soncuaco Pabillo

Vicar Apostolic of Taytay, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1955 Born
1 Apr 198126.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 198227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
199943.8IncardinatedPriest of Puerto Princesa, Philippines
24 May 200651.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
24 May 200651.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitifis
19 Aug 200651.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitifis
10 Feb 202064.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Manila, Philippines
24 Jun 202166.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Manila, Philippines
29 Jun 202166.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taytay, Philippines
19 Aug 202166.4InstalledVicar Apostolic of Taytay, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Broderick Soncuaco Pabillo
Bishop Broderick Soncuaco Pabillo (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Taytay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVictorias City
Ordained BishopSan Ezekiel de Moreno, Church, Macarascas

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Taytay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,221
  • ab: CB, 10 Feb 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 6 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Jul 2021

Quantcast