Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Victoriano Román Zárate (de San José), O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Palawan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1875BornPuebla de Arganzon, Spain
4 Aug 189318.4ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
18 Dec 189722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
21 Apr 191136.1AppointedPrefect of Palawan, Philippines
1936²60.8ResignedPrefect of Palawan, Philippines
27 Dec 194772.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Palawan, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Victoriano Román Zárate (de San José):
Father Victoriano Román Zárate (de San José) O.A.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Palawan

  • a priest for 50.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • r/d: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014