Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severo Cagátan Caérmare

Bishop of Dipolog, Philippines

Apostolic Administrator of Iligan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1969 Born
22 Apr 199626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dipolog, Philippines
25 Jul 201444.7AppointedBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
30 Oct 201445.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
6 Dec 201748.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Iligan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Severo Cagátan Caérmare
Bishop Severo Cagátan Caérmare (born ) Bishop of Dipolog

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoblacion
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Most Holy Rosary, Cathedral, Dipolog, Diocese of Dipolog

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dipolog.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 19 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,316
  • ab: CB, 8 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast