Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Pinto

Apostolic Nuncio to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Pandosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1952 BornNoci, Italy
1 Apr 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 200149.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pandosia
4 Dec 200149.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sénégal
4 Dec 200149.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mauritania
6 Jan 200249.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pandosia
5 Feb 200249.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
5 Feb 200249.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
5 Mar 200249.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
6 Dec 200755.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
10 May 201159.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pinto:
Archbishop Giuseppe Pinto (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Philippines

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Philippines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,094

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Aug 2014