Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Cabanada Villarojo

Bishop of Malolos, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1967 Born
10 Jun 199427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
3 Jul 201548.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
3 Jul 201548.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
10 Aug 201548.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
14 May 201952.0AppointedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
21 Aug 201952.3InstalledBishop of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Dennis Cabanada Villarojo
Bishop Dennis Cabanada Villarojo (born ) Bishop of Malolos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCebu City, Archdiocese of Cebu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu City, Archdiocese of Cebu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Malolos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 3 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2015
  • c2+: CB, 3 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,559
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2019
  • i: CB, 17 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 18 May 2019

Quantcast