Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David William Valencia Antonio

Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia

Titular Bishop of Basti

Apostolic Administrator of San Jose in Mindoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1963 BornNagtupacan, Sto. Domingo, Ilocos Sur
1 Dec 198824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
15 Jun 201147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
15 Jun 201147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
26 Aug 201147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti
21 Nov 201551.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for David William Valencia Antonio:
Bishop David William Valencia Antonio (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob: CB, 25 Jun 2011
  • c2: CB, 11 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,131
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015