Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruben Tolentino Profugo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucena, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1938Born
18 Dec 196527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lucena, Philippines
27 Aug 197941.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lucena, Philippines
27 Aug 197941.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
18 Oct 197941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua
15 May 198244.0AppointedBishop of Lucena, Philippines
13 Sep 200365.4ResignedBishop of Lucena, Philippines
12 May 201476.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucena, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ruben Tolentino Profugo
Bishop Ruben Tolentino Profugo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucena

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018