Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Racelis Rañola

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Claternae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1932 Born
26 Mar 195623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lucena, Philippines
24 Feb 199057.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
24 Feb 199057.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Claternae
4 Apr 199057.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claternae
2 Oct 200371.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Racelis Rañola
Bishop Antonio Racelis Rañola (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cebu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018