Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patricio Maqui Lopez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia

Titular Bishop of Arba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1926BornBangar
10 Mar 195124.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 198558.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
16 Oct 198558.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
5 Dec 198559.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba
20 Feb 199164.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Patricio Maqui Lopez:
Bishop Patricio Maqui Lopez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013