Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciceron Santa Maria Tumbocon

Deceased

Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1922Born
13 Mar 194825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
18 Aug 198260.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
7 Oct 198260.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
7 Apr 198360.9SucceededBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
11 Nov 199068.5DiedBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ciceron Santa Maria Tumbocon
Bishop Ciceron Santa Maria Tumbocon (born , died ) Bishop of Cabanatuan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbajay
Ordained BishopBasilica, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • opd/c1: CB, 18 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast