Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patricio Abella Buzon, S.D.B.

Bishop of Bacolod


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1950 BornSan Nicolas
29 Jun 196717.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 197626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Dec 200252.7AppointedBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
19 Feb 200352.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
12 Mar 200352.9InstalledBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
24 May 201666.1AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Patricio Abella Buzon
Bishop Patricio Abella Buzon S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Bacolod

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bacolod.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,331
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016