Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesar Castro Raval, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bangued, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1924Born
22 May 195227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
15 Dec 198156.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bangued, Philippines
15 Dec 198156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
18 Feb 198257.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali
25 Nov 198863.9AppointedBishop of Bangued, Philippines
18 Jan 199267.0ResignedBishop of Bangued, Philippines
30 Jan 201792.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bangued, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cesar Castro Raval
Bishop Cesar Castro Raval S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bangued

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaoag
Death PlaceQuezon City

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 30 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017