Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambroise Uma Arakayo Amabe

Deceased

Bishop of Isiro-Niangara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1930BornGiro (Watsa)
25 Jun 196131.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 197242.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 May 197242.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
20 Aug 197242.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
19 Feb 197646.1SucceededBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Apr 198959.3DiedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Ambroise Uma Arakayo Amabe:
Bishop Ambroise Uma Arakayo Amabe (died ) Bishop of Isiro-Niangara

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013